SHORTCUTS FOR MULTIPLICATION

Dear Readers
In this post we have written about some basic SHORTCUTS FOR MULTIPLICATION which can be useful to you while solving simplification questions or any other questions in maths which involve multiplication . What we did basically is break the numbers which makes the question easy to solve and save your time also in the exams .

So Read here the SHORTCUTS FOR MULTIPLICATION

  • To multiply a number by 11 :
    121 X 11

    Step 1: Write the unit digit as it is i.e., 1
    Step 2: Add the ten’s and unit digit
    2+1 =3 (31)
    Step 3: Now, Add the Hundred’s and ten’s digit
    1+2=3 (331)
    Step 4 : Write the hundred’s digit as it is
    1
    Therefore the Answer will be 1331

  • To multiply a number by 12:
    Apply this formula
    a X 10 + a X 2 = b

    487 X 12
    487 X 10 + 487 X 2 = 4870 + 974
    = 5844

  • To multiply a number by 13 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 10 + a X 3 = b

    487 X 13
    487 X 10 + 487 X 3 = 4870 + 1461
    = 6331

  • To multiply a number by 14 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 7 = b
    b X 2 = c

    487 X 14
    487 X 7= 3409
    3409 X 2 = 6818

  • To multiply a number by 15 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 10 + a X 5 = b

    487 X 15
    487 X 10 + 487 X 5 = 4870 + 2435
    = 7305

  • To multiply a number by 16 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 8 = b
    b X 2 = c

    487 X 16
    487 X 8 = 3896
    3896 X 2 = 7792

  • To multiply a number by 19 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 20 – a = b

    487 X 19
    487 X 20 – 487 = 9740 – 487
    =9253

  • To multiply a number by 21 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 7 = b
    b X 3 = c

    487 X 21
    487 X 7 = 3409
    3409 X 3 = 10227

  • To multiply a number by 22 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 2 = b
    b X 11 = c

    487 X 2 =974
    974 X 11 =10714

  • To multiply a number by 23 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 20 + a X 3 = b

    487 X 20 + 487 X 3 = 9740 + 1461
    = 11201

  • To multiply a number by 24 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 8 = b
    b X 3 = c

    487 X 8 = 3896
    3896 X 3 = 11688

  • To multiply a number by 25:
    Apply this formula
    a X 20 + a X 5 = b

    487 X 20 + 487 X 5 = 9740 + 2435
    = 12175

  • To multiply a number by 28:
    Apply this formula
    a X 30 – a X 2 = b

    487 X 30 – 487 X 2 =14610 – 974
    = 13636

  • To multiply a number by 28 :
    Apply this formula
    a X 30 – a = b

    487 X 30 – 487 = 14610 -487
    =14123